ST MATTHEWS CHURCH YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 522742
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The building owned by the charity is rented out, and operated as a day nursery by an independent company. The income generated after meeting expenses is used for the support of various projects working with children and young people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £10,360
Total expenditure: £15,487

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Walsall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 November 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jeremy Peter Sargent Trustee 16 February 2022
THE VINE TRUST WALSALL
Received: 78 days late
THE WALSALL BLUE COAT CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOLS
Received: On time
JOHN CHARLES PRYCE-JONES Trustee 21 October 2013
FRIENDS OF SHROPSHIRE ARCHIVES
Received: On time
Graham Hird Trustee 01 January 2004
None on record
STEVEN LESLIE PARKER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.61k £5.20k £12.20k £9.85k £10.36k
Total expenditure £11.09k £7.08k £4.52k £8.63k £15.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 06 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. MATTHEWS CHURCH OFFICE
ST. MATTHEWS CLOSE
WALSALL
WS1 3DG
Phone:
01922626039
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available