UNIVERSITY OF BATH STUDENTS' UNION (BUSU)

Charity number: 1206187
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sports, arts, cultural, departmental, recreational, media, volunteering and diversity & support student groups; representation both academic and in areas such as accommodation, campus facilities, town/gown relations and national issues; support in housing, academic and welfare advice, peer mentoring and peer assisted learning; training, development and entrepreneurial opportunities and a job shop.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 December 2023: Standard registration
  • 23 July 2024: Funds received from 1143154 UNIVERSITY OF BATH STUDENTS' UNION (BUSU)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jimena Alamo Chair 14 December 2023
None on record
William George Lomax Trustee 27 March 2025
None on record
Zuber Malik Lakhani Trustee 21 June 2024
None on record
Olivia Warner Trustee 21 June 2024
None on record
Benjamin Orford Thompson Trustee 21 June 2024
None on record
Christine Gibbons Trustee 02 February 2024
THE GERAINT THOMAS CYCLING TRUST
Received: On time
SUSSEX COUNTY SPORTS PARTNERSHIP TRUST
Received: On time
THE SUSSEX COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Barry Hughes Trustee 31 January 2024
None on record
Professor Bernard John Morley Trustee 31 January 2024
None on record
David Lam Trustee 31 January 2024
None on record
Amber Jean Snary Trustee 31 January 2024
None on record
Rebecca Board Trustee 14 December 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2024
Total gross income £3.00m
Total expenditure £2.97m
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants £47.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.64m
Income - Other trading activities £178.06k
Income - Charitable activities £1.17m
Income - Endowments £0
Income - Investment £11.81k
Income - Other £0
Income - Legacies £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.90m
Expenditure - Raising funds £76.04k
Expenditure - Governance £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0
Expenditure - Other £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2024
Own use assets £135.54k
Long-term investments £0
Other assets £1.24m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0
Total liabilities £172.18k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 07 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 07 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
UNIVERSITY OF BATH SU
CLAVERTON DOWN
BATH
BA2 7AY
Phone:
01225383800