EMMANUEL CHURCH BRIDLINGTON

Charity Number: 1206827
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Emmanuel Church provides a building as a place of worship. It conducts religious ceremonies for the public, including baptisms, weddings and funerals. It educates children and adults about the Christian faith and seeks to share the Good News with others. It provides pastoral care and many activities of benefit to both church members and the wider community.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 February 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr RICHARD HARE Chair 03 June 2016
TABS INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
HOPE HOUSING BRIDLINGTON
Received: On time
Rev Heather Groocock Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Natalie Mallinson Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Joyce Carr Trustee 23 March 2023
None on record
Phoenix Chapman Trustee 23 March 2023
None on record
Helen Jackson Trustee 15 November 2022
None on record
Carol Ann Slade Trustee 15 April 2022
None on record
John Dixon Trustee 15 April 2022
None on record
Rev Barbara Bancroft Trustee 15 April 2010
None on record
Peter Jenkinson Trustee 15 April 2010
None on record
Barbara Jenkinson Trustee 15 April 2010
None on record
Caroline Hodges Trustee 15 April 2010
None on record
DAVID BALDOCK Trustee 27 April 2006
BRIDLINGTON SCHOOL
Received: On time
BRIDLINGTON SCHOOL PRIZES FUND
Received: On time
BRIDLINGTON SCHOOL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
EMMANUEL CHURCH
CARDIGAN ROAD
BRIDLINGTON
YO15 3JT
Phone:
01262603033