ST CHAD'S LEEDS SCOUTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scout Group with the following: Beaver Colony, Cub Pack, Scouts. Usual activities e.g. regular meetings, camps, outdoor activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Leeds City
Governance
- 24 August 1972: Standard registration
- 19TH N LEEDS (ST CHAD'S) SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- 19TH NW LEEDS (ST CHADS) SCOUT GROUP COUNCIL (Working name)
- ST CHAD'S LEEDS SCOUTS AND GUIDES (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEVILLE FELL | Chair | 24 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kerrie Digings-Woods | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Jane Connor | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Fogg | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Cooper | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Hinchliffe | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Manjit McKenzie | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE BEDFORD | Trustee | 15 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.73k | £8.02k | £16.51k | £27.82k | £33.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.35k | £12.35k | £13.98k | £27.44k | £34.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP
Area of benefit
LEEDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Weetwood Avenue
LEEDS
Leeds
LS16 5NF
- Phone:
- 07808731347
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window