SHEFFIELD SCOUT RESOURCES CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for Scout Movement in City of Sheffield
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 12 February 1964: Standard registration
- SGS OUTDOORS (Working name)
- SHEFFIELD BOY SCOUTS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- SHEFFIELD CITY SCOUT COUNCIL (Previous name)
- SHEFFIELD CITY SCOUT COUNCIL FORMERLY SHEFFIELD LOCAL ASSOCIATION OF BOY SCOUTS (Previous name)
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN CHARLES LASHMAR | Chair |
|
||||||||
Stephen Philip Wilkinson | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Jonathan Biglands | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
JAMES WILLIAM CARROLL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
STEPHEN JAMES CULMER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PETER JOHN STEVENSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DAVID THOMAS HOAR | Trustee |
|
||||||||
ALAN STEWARTSON CULL JP | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.81k | £54.81k | £56.13k | £63.88k | £83.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.74k | £42.38k | £52.90k | £70.30k | £69.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £6.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 24 MARCH 1997 as amended on 01 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE SCOUTING WITHIN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND TO PROVIDE SUPPORT FOR SCOUT DISTRICT AND SCOUT GROUPS WITHIN THE CITY BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, RECREATIONAL AND TRAINING FACILITIES, UNIFORM AND EQUIPMENT SUPPLIES, FINANCIAL AID AND BY ANY OTHER APPROPRIATE MEANS. 2) ALTHOUGH NOT FORMING PART OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION OF THE UNITED KINGDOM THE CHARITY SHALL IN ALL ITS ACTIVITIES AND THE EXERCISE OF ITS POWERS FAITHFULLY OBSERVE THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
CITY OF SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHEFFIELD SCOUT RESOURCE CHARITY
60-68 TRIPPET LANE
SHEFFIELD
S1 4EL
- Phone:
- 01142737922
- Email:
- sheff.scouts@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window