THE SUNDERLAND ORPHANAGE AND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide financial assistance by the way of pocket money, student and clothing allowances to children who have one or two deceased, disabled, separated or divorced parents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sunderland
Governance
- 08 December 1965: Standard registration
- THE SUNDERLAND ORPHANAGE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Councillor Stephen Lewis Elms | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Ehthesham Haque | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Clare MacLaren-Sheppard | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Kathleen Wilson | Trustee | 20 September 2016 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL DIXON | Trustee | 25 June 2014 |
|
|||||
DAVID SNOWDON | Trustee | 25 June 2014 |
|
|||||
LINDA COLLING | Trustee | 28 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR ROSALIND COPELAND | Trustee | 02 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.81k | £21.49k | £22.01k | £22.85k | £23.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.00k | £18.85k | £32.95k | £25.45k | £35.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 29 MAY 1964
Charitable objects
(A)PROVIDING BOARD,POCKET MONEY,CLOTHING,TOOLS,INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS,AND IN PAYING THE COST OF REASONABLE HOLIDAYS AND SPECIAL MEDICAL TREATMENT,FOR BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE ATTENDING ANY SCHOOL,UNIVERSITY OR OTHER PLACE OF LEARNING APPROVED BY THE PRINCIPALS;(B)AWARDING TO BENEFICIARIES SCHOLARSHIPS,BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL,UNIVERSITY OR OTHER PLACE OF LEARNING APPROVED BY THE PRINCIPALS;(C)PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE,OUTFITS,CLOTHING,TOOLS,INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO HELP BENEFICIARIES ON LEAVING SCHOOL,A UNIVERSITY OR ANY OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT TO PREPARE FOR,OR TO ENTER,A PROFESSION,TRADE OR CALLING;(D)AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO TRAVEL ABROAD TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION;(E)PROVIDING,OR ASSISTING THE PROVISION OF,FACILITIES,OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY,FOR RECREATION AND SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING,INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF COACHING IN ATHLETICS,SPORTS AND GAMES,FOR BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE RECEIVING PRIMARY,SECONDARY OR FURTHER EDUCATION;AND(F)PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO STUDY MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS.
Area of benefit
COUNTY BOROUGH OF SUNDERLAND AND NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 JOHN STREET
SUNDERLAND
TYNE AND WEAR
SR1 1QU
- Phone:
- 01915656561
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window