WITTON GILBERT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
advertise availability of funding, recieve and process applications , issue cheques and administrate accounts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Durham
Governance
- 27 July 1965: Standard registration
- THE FINNEY CHARITY (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Caroline Dick | Chair | 30 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Rev Michael John Peers | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Patricia Bainbridge | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Waldock | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Wilcox | Trustee | 30 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
FRANK MORRELL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.71k | £1.89k | £1.44k | £1.61k | £1.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.20k | £1.80k | £1.80k | £900 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 13 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 March 2022 | 226 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 3 NOVEMBER 1922 AS VARIED BY SCHEE DATED 27 JUNE 1938
Charitable objects
1. ASSISTING BOYS OR GIRLS FOR PURPOSES OF EDUCATION OTHER THAN ELEMENTARY. 2. ATTENDING TO HEALTH OR PHYSICAL CONDITION OF CHILDREN ATTENDING PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOLS. 3. OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING, OF BOYS AND GIRLS OF THE POORER CLASSES.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF WITTON GILBERT
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Hillside
Witton Gilbert
DURHAM
DH7 6RB
- Phone:
- 07904718423
- Email:
- cowanlm1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window