THE YARLET TRUST

Charity number: 528618
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Nursery, Pre Prep and Preparatory School

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 May 1970: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanne Betteley Chair 26 November 2018
None on record
Serena Goslett Trustee 11 March 2024
None on record
Jenna Scobie Trustee 17 January 2024
None on record
Susan Beech Trustee 20 November 2023
None on record
Samuel Cromwell Griffiths Trustee 20 November 2023
None on record
Eva Jean Cartwright Trustee 20 November 2023
None on record
Mark George Pickering Trustee 20 November 2023
None on record
Victoria Tomlinson Trustee 20 November 2023
None on record
Jeremy Lefroy Trustee 23 November 2020
STAFFORD WORKS
Received: On time
Global Coalition for Youth Employment
Received: On time
Community Foundation for Staffordshire and Shropshire
Received: On time
THE TRAIDCRAFT FOUNDATION
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF THE GUILDHALL, NEWCASTLE UNDER LYME
Received: On time
CAFE AFRICA TRUST
Received: On time
THE DONALD MACKAY TRUST
Received: On time
THE MYCRO TRUST
Received: On time
THE BUCKE COLLINS CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
TANZANIA DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
THE RELATIONSHIPS FOUNDATION
Received: 86 days late
STAFFORD AND DISTRICT CARERS HOLIDAY TRUST
Received: On time
STAFFORDSHIRE HISTORY DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £1.47m £1.48m £1.64m £1.91m £2.06m
Total expenditure £1.53m £1.49m £1.68m £1.86m £2.01m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £175.83k
Income from government grants N/A £102.53k £15.54k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £49.00k £12.95k £5.40k £1.16k £1.16k
Income - Other trading activities £6.57k £5.98k £12.68k £9.28k £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.40m £1.34m £1.61m £1.86m £1.88m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £1 £65 £948
Income - Other £11.92k £112.05k £15.88k £45.78k £174.19k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.53m £1.47m £1.65m £1.84m £2.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.58k £2.52k £25.76k £13.09k £16.36k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £36.41k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £15.64k £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £435.36k £409.49k £436.84k £415.43k £453.10k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £366.04k £120.70k £326.70k £365.15k £364.33k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £593.92k £337.05k £603.26k £564.18k £558.28k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 02 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 02 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 22 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 26 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 July 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 03 July 2021 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 11 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Yarlet School
Yarlet
Stafford
ST18 9SU
Phone:
07814234851