FRIENDS OF YSGOL CRUG GLAS

Charity number: 700337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST THE PUPILS OF YSGOL CRUG GLAS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AT THE SCHOOL, NOT USUALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY, AND MAY - FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS & OTHERS - ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT - HELP PROVIDE FACILITIES TO MEET THE SPECIAL NEEDS OF THE PUPILS

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £6,500
Total expenditure: £2,900

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Swansea

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 November 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HOME SCHOOL ASSOCIATION OF DYFATTY SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ishbel Hansen Chair 12 May 2023
None on record
Sian Channon Trustee 12 May 2023
None on record
Sian Roberts Treasurer Trustee 16 October 2020
None on record
MR J.Q. HAWKINS Trustee
TY OGOF
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £13.97k £12.45k £2.75k £1.05k £6.50k
Total expenditure £13.43k £21.51k £2.00k £133.15k £2.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ysgol Crug Glas
Croft Street
Swansea
SA1 1QA
Phone:
01792652388