THE ETHEL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a community barge service providing educational, therapeutic and leisure outings on our purpose built barge for the most marginalised communities throughout South Yorkshire. We also offer skills based training courses in boat-handling and skippering.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Barnsley
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 23 June 1988: Standard registration
- THE ETHEL TRUST COMMUNITY BARGE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dorothy Glossop | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dave Poulsom | Trustee | 26 January 2016 |
|
|||||
David Hedley Tuck | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|||||
KEITH LEVY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.77k | £653.68k | £119.08k | £177.53k | £91.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.27k | £59.91k | £35.67k | £85.96k | £80.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £653.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £188 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £609.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £59.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £351 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £2.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 JUNE 1988
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC BY THE IMPROVEMENT AND DIFFUSION OF KNOWLEDGE OF LOCAL, REGIONAL AND NATIONAL HISTORY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CIRCLE
33 ROCKINGHAM LANE
SHEFFIELD
S1 4FW
- Phone:
- 07722678168
- Email:
- ethelbarge@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window