THE BEDALE HALL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the Bedale Hall Trust is to restore and maintain the 18th century hall building and provide a community centre for the benefit of the inhabitants of Bedale and the surrounding district. As part of this mission, the Trust maintains the Bedale Museum and the Bedale Tourist Information Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2017
Total income includes £13,000 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 11 November 1988: Standard registration
- 19 January 2018: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 19 January 2018: Funds transferred to 1171403 BEDALE HALL CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION
No other names
- Paying staff
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.55k | £98.23k | £124.10k | £103.43k | £139.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.01k | £82.78k | £107.94k | £104.82k | £182.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.00k | £3.35k | £13.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 21 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | 21 November 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | 08 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2016
(These accounts |
08 November 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 30 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | 30 October 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | 20 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | 20 December 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 13 SEPTEMBER 1988
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES COMPRISING THE FORMER RURAL DISTRICT OF BEDALE NAMELY CRAKEHALL, RAND GRANGE, EAST TANFIELD, WEST TANFIELD, EXELBY, LEEMING AND NEWTON, GATENBY,FIRBY, SNAPE WITH THORPE, HOWGRAVE, SUTTON HOWGRAVE, KIRKLINGTON CUM UPSLAND, KILLERBY, KIRBY FLEETHAM WITH FENCOTE, SCRUTON WELL, AINDERBY MIERS WITH HOLTBY, HACKFORTH, LANGTHORNE, AISKEW, BEDALE, BURNESTON, SWAINBY WITH ALLERTHORPE, THEAKSTON, BERRILL WITH COWLING, THORNTON WATLASS, CARTHORPE, CLIFTON ON NYORE, ROOKWITH AND THIRN WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES EDUCATION AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window