SOMERSET BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Somerset Building Perservation Trust acts as an organisation of "last resort" to restore and repair buildings of historic interest which would otherwise be lost.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £98,321 from 10 government grant(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Somerset
Governance
- 16 February 1989: Standard registration
- SOMERSET BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST (Previous name)
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICK STOW | Chair | 07 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Sir Piers Anthony De Walton Denny | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Nigel Jones | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Cllr Hugh Davies | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Cllr Martin Lovell | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Greg Venn | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Ann Manders | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Tim Kerley | Trustee | 29 June 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||
JAMES HOLYDAY | Trustee | 20 June 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||||
DR John Prideaux | Trustee | 20 June 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Adron Duckworth | Trustee | 20 June 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Tony Grimes Cllr | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
RAY STOKES | Trustee | 12 February 2013 |
|
|||||||||||||||
PATRICK BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||
DAVID GRENVILLE HUNTLY GORDON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.46k | £16.97k | £11.08k | £5.34k | £102.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.33k | £13.89k | £15.98k | £24.92k | £101.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.62k | £6.20k | £7.91k | N/A | £98.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 May 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21ST NOVEMBER 1988
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF SOMERSET AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE, WHATEVER OF THE ENGLISH HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE AS MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND SOMERSET IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST.
Area of benefit
SOMERSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 St. Medard Road
WEDMORE
Somerset
BS28 4AY
- Phone:
- 07968083741
- Email:
- secretary@sbpt.info
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window