THE SAMUEL COURTAULD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Please see Report of the Trustees for details of objectives and activities of the Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 22 May 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Hochhauser KC | Chair | 01 December 2019 |
|
|||||||
Alderman Simon Tony Pryke | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
Charmian Caines | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
Ina De | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|||||||
Mark Nicholas Hamilton Hoffman | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Rosalind Polly Blakesley | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Sally Osman | Trustee | 19 May 2020 |
|
|||||||
Charles Booth-Clibborn | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Lord John Browne | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
Lara Barton | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Henry Legge KC | Trustee | 20 February 2014 |
|
|
||||||
PROFESSOR ROGER EMERY | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £538.30k | £74.81k | £73.22k | £373.68k | £199.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £478.74k | £777.15k | £133.58k | £206.65k | £307.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £413.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £15.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £110.09k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £460.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £18.52k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £57.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £18.52k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 14 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 14 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/08/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/12/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/03/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/06/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/07/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30/03/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/06/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE INSTITUTE AND THE UNIVERSITY OR OTHERWISE PUBLIC EDUCATION OF AND INTEREST IN THE HISTORY OF ART AND ARCHAEOLOGY CRITICISM OF ART AND ARCHAEOLOGY AND CONSERVATION OF WORKS OF ART.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 22 May 1991 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
COURTAULD INSTITUTE OF ART
SOMERSET HOUSE
STRAND
LONDON
WC2R 0RN
- Phone:
- 02039477613
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window