STROUD VALLEYS PROJECT LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of Stroud Valleys Project (SVP) is to protect and enhance the local environment by working with local communities to embrace sustainable development and biodiversity, and so to make Stroud and its surrounding area a better, healthier place in which to live for both present and future generations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £40,331 from 5 government contract(s) and £51,160 from 5 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 16 August 1989: Standard registration
- S V P (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stella Parkes | Chair | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Arundel | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Brown | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ratcliffe | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Mark Graham | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER SECCOMBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFREY BECKERLEG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £254.73k | £160.60k | £225.28k | £253.89k | £308.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £207.08k | £172.93k | £244.61k | £258.14k | £281.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £24.47k | £10.31k | £28.40k | £37.65k | £40.33k | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.50k | £45.57k | £83.70k | £43.05k | £51.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH FEBRUARY 1988 AS AMENDED 23 MAY 1989, 4 APRIL 1995, 26 NOVEMBER 1999 AND 31 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY, INDUSTRIAL ARCHAEOLOGY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE STROUD DISTRICT, IN LINE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT. TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE BUILT ENVIRONMENT AND THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE STROUD DISTRICT, IN LINE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE LIVING, WORKING IN OR RESORTING TO THE STROUD DISTRICT IN LINE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
STROUD DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 THREADNEEDLE STREET
STROUD
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
GL5 1AF
- Phone:
- 01453753358
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window