Dogfen lywodraethu FRIENDS OF THE EARTH CHARITABLE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/12/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/02/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/12/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/10/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 APR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 NOV 2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23 AUG 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ECOLOGY, NATURAL HISTORY,RESOURCE CONSERVATION, SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND ENVIRONMENTAL STUDIES; B. THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND SUSTAINABLE USE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE EARTH'S NATURAL ENVIRONMENT INCLUDING BIO-DIVERSITY, ATMOSPHERE, WATER, LAND AND NATURAL RESOURCES; C. THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (I) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION, AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES; (II)CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. 'SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT' MEANS IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE WHILE LIVING WITHIN THE CARRYING CAPACITY OF SUPPORTING ECOSYSTEMS AND THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT. 2.2 NOTHING IN THE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008
Maes buddion
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.