Dogfen lywodraethu Age UK Enfield
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 APR 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 OCT 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 APR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 DEC 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 DEC 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 FEB 2023 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15 FEB 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND/OR OLDER PEOPLE WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT: 3.1.1 PREVENTING OR RELIEVING THE POVERTY OF OLDER PEOPLE; 3.1.2 ADVANCING EDUCATION; 3.1.3 PREVENTING OR RELIEVING SICKNESS, DISEASE OR SUFFERING IN OLDER PEOPLE (WHETHER EMOTIONAL, MENTAL OR PHYSICAL); 3.1.4 PROMOTING EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; 3.1.5 PROMOTING THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF OLDER PEOPLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS; 3.1.6 ASSISTING OLDER PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, SOCIAL EXCLUSION OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND 3.1.7 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF OLDER PEOPLE AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; THE OUTCOME OF THIS BEING THE PROMOTION OF THE WELL-BEING OF OLDER PEOPLE.
Maes buddion
GREATER LONDON
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.