Trustees DORCHESTER ARTS
Charity number: 1015546
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Louise Wakeman | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Hutchinson | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Willdridge | Trustee | 28 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Emily Constable | Trustee | 28 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hanna Trevorrow | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Eigeland | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Smith | Trustee | 31 October 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.