Governance THE COAL INDUSTRY SOCIAL WELFARE ORGANISATION
Charity number: 1015581
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 04 December 1992: Standard registration
- 02 November 2012: Funds received from 520476 LOSCOE MINERS WELFARE INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GRO...
- 01 May 2014: Funds received from 230532 PONTEFRACT MINERS' RECREATIONAL CHARITY
- 04 December 2014: Funds received from 522173 ANNESLEY MINERS WELFARE TRUST
- 17 January 2020: Funds received from 520417 BLACKWELL MINERS' WELFARE SCHEME
- 26 April 2023: Funds received from 520565 DAWDON MINERS' SOCIAL WELFARE SCHEME
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
- CISWO (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.