Governing document NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL AFTER-CARE IN REGISTERED CARE HOMES
Charity number: 1017330
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 APRIL 1989 AS AMENDED 26 APRIL 1990, 18 APRIL 1991, 4 OCTOBER 1994 AND 4 MAY 1995. AND 18 APRIL 1997.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THOSE PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN SUFFERING FROM A MENTAL DISORDER.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.