Trustees MUDIAD MEITHRIN
Charity number: 1022320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Catrin Edwards | Chair | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Noam Mabon Megira Devey | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Roddick | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
Owen Glyn Derbyshire | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Geraldine Lublin | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Gwennan Schiavone | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Savanna Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Elin Maher | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Huw Marshall | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|||||||
Gwenno George | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Corinna Lloyd-Jones | Trustee | 21 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Alison Rees-Edwards | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Huw Williams | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Anita Evans | Trustee | 15 October 2014 |
|
|||||||
Dr Rhodri Llwyd Morgan | Trustee | 11 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MAI ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
RHIANWEN HUWS ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.