Trustees UNISON WELFARE
Charity number: 1023552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tony Wright | Chair | 14 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Mark Fisher | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Evans | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denise Thomas | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Bouskill | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donald Taylor | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Buckley | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Warrican | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PAGE | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH POTTER | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karen Poole | Trustee | 21 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.