Trustees CLWYD COUNTY GUIDES
Charity number: 1029693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINA HUNT | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Joanna Rachel Ritchie | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Quayle | Trustee | 07 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Louise Margaret Pigott | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Fox | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paula McPeake | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Williams | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Blore | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Denney | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Lewis | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
jennifer maxwell | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE DUFFIELD | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Ruth Davies | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Megan Andrea Jones | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.