Trustees BILLERICAY CATHOLIC PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1037616
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caoilfhionn Cubitt | Chair | 09 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Walker | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Francesco Somma | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Thorne | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Nolan | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carly Edwards | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Amos | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Billie Foyle | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thalia Beckwith | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Venables | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Kelly | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven Kew | Trustee | 08 February 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.