Trustees HEATONS-REDDISH GROUP U3A
Charity number: 1037772
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH GORDON | Chair | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
JILL CALDER | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Walker | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Lloyd | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jude Wells | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Moorhouse | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Mitchell | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Barbara Canning | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clare Zita Downing | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Needham | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
THERESA MARIA ROGERS | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA DUNNE | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.