Trustees 1ST BISHOPSTON BRISTOL SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1038881
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janina Schembri | Chair | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Ashley | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Gunz | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Shaddick | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beth Sutherland | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Wakefield | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Smith | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ollie Edwards | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Hodgkinson | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Johnson | Trustee | 07 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Wainwright | Trustee | 15 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Chris Brooker | Trustee | 15 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Thomas | Trustee | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elinor Davies | Trustee | 09 May 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.