Trustees BOURNE ABBEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY ACADEMY PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1040896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Chalkley | Chair | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Fisher | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Baker | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Baker | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Harvey | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Bergmann | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Smith | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hollie Dalgleish | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Bellamy | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Clare Blades | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Podgorski | Trustee | 16 October 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.