Trustees ST FRANCIS PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1042352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Critchley | Chair | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Burt | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diana Dyjak Zieba | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simona Chiorescu | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Marie | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenna-Louise Dunstall | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Elizabeth Clarke | Trustee | 12 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mariana Julia Tassara Dumrauf | Trustee | 05 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dorota Underwood | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.