Trustees THE GREEN ALLIANCE TRUST
Charity number: 1045395
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Sandys | Chair | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Reeves | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor Anusha Shah | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dhara Vyas | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Craig Lindsay Bennett | Trustee | 19 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Benet Northcote | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Rita Clifton CBE | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Paul Lambert | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BALDOCK | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|||||
ALISON MARY AUSTIN OBE | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAME FIONA CLAIRE REYNOLDS DBE | Trustee | 08 December 1998 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.