Trustees 13th Howdon Scouts
Charity number: 1054270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL MELODY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Beverley Proud | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Lawlor | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Aurora Louise Kerr | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alsion Russell | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hale | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Thirlaway | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Doughty | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MELODY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNN THIRLAWAY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.