Trustees THE FINNISH SATURDAY SCHOOL IN CAMBERLEY
Charity number: 1059715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timo Rinttila | Chair | 15 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Niina Trangmar | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sebastian Alexander George Puncher | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matti Tapani Kohonen | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emilia Anneli Leah | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eeva Forde | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Satu Glaser | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Arnell | Trustee | 24 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Minna Woodward | Trustee | 18 May 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.