Governing document TRINITY FIELDS TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 OCT 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 APR 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 JUL 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 APR 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 JAN 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 SEP 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS”) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO PROVIDE IN THE INTEREST OF RECREATION AND SOCIAL WELFARE A PUBLIC RECREATION GROUND AND PLAYING FIELD KNOWN AS TRINITY FIELDS (THE “RECREATION GROUND”) FOR THE USE PRIMARILY OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OR WANDSWORTH AND LAMBETH WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND ALSO, TO THE EXTENT THAT SUCH USE DOES NOT CONFLICT WITH THE PRIMARY USE REFERRED TO ABOVE, FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS GENERALLY OF THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF WANDSWORTH AND LAMBETH
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGHS OF WANDSWORTH AND LAMBETH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.