Register of Charities - The Charity Commission SARAH DAVIS BEQUEST
Charity number: 227865-1
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL DATED 30TH MARCH 1894. PROVED 19TH APRIL 1899. UN REP VOL. 122.PP 306. ORDER OF HIGH COURT DATED 25TH NOVEMBER 1902.
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE BRITISH ASYLUM FOR DEAF & DUMB FEMALES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Registration history
- 21 October 1963: Standard registration
- 09 July 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.