Register of Charities - The Charity Commission RICHMOND CHARITIES ALMSHOUSES
Charity number: 200431-7
Linked charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION DATED 17 DECEMBER 2008
AS AMENDED ON 24 JUL 2017
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13 AUG 2019
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23 SEP 2020
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 08 OCT 2020
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07 FEB 2022
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE:
(A) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR ELDERLY PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, WITH A PREFERENCE FOR ELDERLY PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE WITHIN THE LAST FIVE YEARS BEEN RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, AT LEAST 50% OF WHOM MUST HAVE BEEN BROUGHT UP AND INSTRUCTED IN THE PROTESTANT RELIGION, WITH A PREFERENCE FOR MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND; AND
(B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE; AND
(C) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
(2) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PARTS 2 AND 3 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR USE FOR THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND UPON THAMES
Registration history
- 21 June 1990: Standard registration
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.