Trustees THE RICHMOND AID IN SICKNESS FUND
Charity number: 200434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEREMY WILLIAMS | Chair | 04 June 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||
ROBERT HALL | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||
PAUL PHILLIPS | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
JONATHAN BLYTHE | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
CLLR RICHARD PYNE | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||
EMMA HALFORD | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
KATHRYN ANN O'BRIEN | Trustee | 21 November 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||
MICHAEL TOWNSIN | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev WILMA ROEST MA | Trustee | 25 July 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||
Katherine Theresa Maxwell | Trustee | 21 October 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||
MARGARET ANNE MARSHALL | Trustee | 14 May 2012 |
|
|||||||||||||
MR SERGE LOURIE | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||
PETER WILLIAM CHICHELEY MARR | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.