Governing document VOLUNTARY ASSOCIATION FOR SURREY DISABLED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3/11/1937, AS AMENDED 13/6/1960, 4/8/1999. 30/1/2007, 27/9/2011 AND SCHEME SEALED 9/1/2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PHYSICALLY DISABLED PEOPLE IN THE COUNTY OF SURREY IN SUCH WAYS AS THE ASSOCIATION SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE AND IN PARTICULAR BY: ENABLING THOSE PEOPLE TO LIVE MORE INDEPENDENTLY. PROVIDING ADVICE, INFORMATION AND EDUCATION. PROVIDING AND SUPPORTING OPPORTUNITIES FOR RESPITE AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF SURREY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.