Trustees THE COLLEGE OF MATRONS
Charity number: 201720
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Edward Cleasby Probert MA, BA | Chair |
|
||||||||
CELIA JANE LAX | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
ROY BEXON | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
ALASTAIR RICHARD MALCOLM | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
JAYNE LINDA DAVIES | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||||
CHARLES LOVETT GREVILLE-HEYGATE | Trustee | 17 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||
PATRICIA ANNE DRAGONETTI | Trustee | 13 June 2011 |
|
|
||||||
SARAH MARY WHEELER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.