Trustees TAUNTON AND DISTRICT MENCAP SOCIETY
Charity number: 205244
Charity reporting is up to date (127 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Farrand | Chair | 02 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Cathryn Nash | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Stephen Nash | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Sedgbeer | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lee Millward | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Anne Goss | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Moira Jane Cunningham Brown | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Brooks-Daw | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.