Trustees WAR ON WANT
Charity number: 208724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Andrew McKenzie | Chair | 01 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Norah Rosina O'Hare | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mike Cushman | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amber Williams | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
SHABEN NISA BEGUM | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Mark Davies | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alia Al Ghussain | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Mason | Trustee | 18 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Esther Giles | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark David Luetchford | Trustee | 18 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
DR ANNA STONE | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.