Trustees THE NEW CHURCH CHILDREN'S SOCIETY
Charity number: 209126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Chambers | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Sutton | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Ruth Rowlands | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Kenneth Sutton | Trustee | 16 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Judith Mary Taylor | Trustee | 18 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Sybil Chesworth | Trustee | 24 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ANN SUTTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.