Trustees WALTHAM ABBEY NON-EDUCATIONAL PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Charity number: 213327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PETER HENRY SMITH | Chair | 27 July 2011 |
|
|||||||||
Waltham Abbey Town Clerk | Trustee | 22 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Jodie Law | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Alison Mary Caw | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Linda Christine Anderson | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.