Trustees THE NATIONAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO CHILDREN
Charity number: 216401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Anthony Berkett | Chair | 04 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Abigail Zein | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chanelle Wilson | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Michael Daffern | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Corbidge | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Smyth | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Albert Lawrence Heaney | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ife Grillo | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sheanna Patelmaster | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eithne Mary Fiona Daly | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CAMERON KERR | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Jane Gough | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Derrick Edward Mortimer | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Christoforos Toumazis MBE | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Ridgway | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOANNA BEGENT | Trustee | 19 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Tarek Khlat MBE | Trustee | 04 December 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.