Trustees ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Charity number: 217585
Charity reporting is overdue by 175 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev James Prestwood | Chair | 23 July 2014 |
|
|||||
Rev Benjamin Jonathan Willis | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Juliette Sophie Willis | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Rosemary Anne Brooks | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Joanna Grace Epton | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Nadine Palmer | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Kathryn Lydia Marsden | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Benjamin Eric Brady | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Callum William Roper | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Anne Bull | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|||||
David Paul Stapleton | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Jane Louise Pickersgill | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|||||
John Crowder | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Paul Finch | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Moji Wadsworth | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Robert Chard | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Mark Perry | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Linzi Crowder | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Phil Williams | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Barbara Elizabeth Watt | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Lambert | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL CAROL TYRRELL | Trustee | 24 March 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.