Trustees CHRISTIAN POLICE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 220482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Akinlawon | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Evans Chisala | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM NORMAN | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Heather Flanigan | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Skedgell | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graham Alder | Trustee | 20 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dave Valente | Trustee | 21 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Katy Harding | Trustee | 21 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Godfrey | Trustee | 28 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Banks-Lyon | Trustee | 14 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Harry Pearson | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Marie Reavey | Trustee | 11 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Keith Evans | Trustee | 02 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER LITTLETON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK WATTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR CLIFF HARRIES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.