Trustees THE GENERAL SERVICE BOARD OF ALCOHOLICS ANONYMOUS (GREAT BRITAIN) LIMITED
Charity number: 226745
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Holly Sarah Alexander | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ranjana Bell | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Henry James Lowe | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Gipson | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Levente Gabor Patocs | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Patrick Coady | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charon Bourke | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Hamish McSwan | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kieran John Moriarty | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zelma Irene Kesans | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tim John Barker | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrina Cassidy | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gretchen Swisher | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Faul | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Kelly Fox | Trustee | 18 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charles Roberts | Trustee | 18 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Jean Owen | Trustee | 18 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Justin Bernard Tunstall | Trustee | 18 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clive Paul Kilmartin | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Smith | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.