Governance WESTMINSTER ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESAN TRUST AND OTHER TRUST FUNDS ADMINISTERED BY THE WESTMINSTER ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESAN TRUSTEE
Charity number: 233699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 26 May 1964: Standard registration
- 14 September 2016: Funds received from 227112 ARTHUR ROBINSON WILL TRUST
- 11 November 2016: Funds received from 1080500 THE GHANA CATHOLIC CHAPLAINCY
- 22 February 2019: Funds received from 295551 SAWBRIDGEWORTH AND DISTRICT COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY ...
- 01 March 2023: Funds received from 297328 HAND IN HAND GROUP
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
- DIOCESE OF WESTMINSTER (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.