Accounts and annual returns LADY CHARLES BRUCE'S TOOTING CHARITY
Charity number: 238033
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 November 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 November 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 December 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 April 2022 | 158 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 March 2022 | 501 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 March 2022 | 507 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 13 May 2021 | 560 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 22 March 2022 | 873 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window