Governing document SOUTHGATE PROGRESSIVE SYNAGOGUE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 20 NOVEMBER 1953 AND CONSTITUTION AMENDED 10 FEBRUARY 2005 AND 26 JUNE 2008. as amended on 09 Jun 2011 as amended on 24 Jun 2015 as amended on 29 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PROGRESSIVE JUDAISM (B) TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A PLACE OF WORSHIP (C) TO ARRANGE AND CONDUCT RELIGIOUS SERVICES AND RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION CLASSES (D) TO PROMOTE CULTURAL, EDUCATIONAL, SOCIAL AND YOUTH ACTIVITIES (E) TP SOLEMNISE MARRIAGES (F) TO ARRANGE MEANS OF BURIAL OR CREMATION (G) TO ARRANGE AND PERFORM OTHER RELIGIOUS RITES, CHARITABLE DUTIES AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS MAY BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
FORMER M.B. OF SOUTHGATE AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.