Charity overview WEBB'S HOME TRUST
Charity number: 204665-70
Removed charity
Governing document
DEED DATED 27 JULY 1898 AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4 FEBRUARY 1899, SCHEMES OF 25 JULY 1958 AND 5 AUGUST 1983
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS WITH A PREFERENCE FOR PERSONS RESIDING IN THE CITY OF BRISTOL
Area of benefit
BRISTOL.
Registration history
- 13 February 1962: Standard registration
- 10 October 2005: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 10 October 2005: Funds transferred to 1109141-16 BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES' RELIEF IN NEED CHARIT...
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.