Trustees WEST BERKSHIRE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS
Charity number: 246183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STUART STEPHENS | Chair |
|
||||||
Jade Daniel Hardisty | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Shaw | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mackrill | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Karen Buckland | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Sloan | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Marie Hardisty | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Frances Taylor | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Stephens | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jean Lyle | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Stephens | Trustee | 13 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Daulby | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Arrowsmith | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Helen Olivia Whitley | Trustee | 16 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
JACKIE FLYNN | Trustee | 30 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS ANNE BENNETT JP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SYLVIA MARGARET GALBRAITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANE NORMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN ISAACS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS KATE MAYO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRIS BYNG | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.