Governing document THE REVEREND DOCTOR GEORGE RICHARDS' CHARITY FOR POOR CLERGYMEN
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 19/04/1850 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 09/12/1949, 07/12/1965, 05/11/1974 AND 11/04/1984.
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE BENEFIT OF CLERGYMEN OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND WHO ARE DESERVING OF ASSISTANCE AND HAVE THROUGH AGE OR INFIRMITY BECOME INCAPABLE OF PERFORMING THEIR CLERICAL DUTIES OR ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE IN THE PERFORMANCE THEREOF. IN THE PAYMENT OF PENSIONS OF SUCH AMOUNT AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. 2. IF AND SO FAR AS INCOME OF THE CHARITY IS NOT REQUIRED FOR APPLICATION IN ANY YEAR IN MANNER AFORESAID THE SAME MAY BE APPLIED IN GRANTS OF MONEY FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS QUALIFIED AS AFORESAID AND THEIR WIDOWS AND DEPENDANTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.